House | 05/07/2015 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/07/2015. | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Rules suspended. | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 6, 2015. | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Reported favorably (11-0). | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Prefiled. |