House
|
06/12/2015
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/12/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2015
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2015
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 60, nays 42. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2015
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2015
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 28 yeas and 7 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2015
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
House conferees appointed: Montoucet, Robideaux, and Kleckley.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2015
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2015
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Morrish, Donahue, and Riser.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2015
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2015
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 91, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2015
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/09/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2015
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2015
|
Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 28 yeas and 7 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Senate Committee amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 63, nays 41. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on May 7, 2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Reported favorably (10-8).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2015
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2015
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|