LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2015 Regular Session
House
Bills
HR117
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HR117
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2015 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HR117
Action History
House
06/10/2015
Called from the calendar.
House
06/10/2015
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
House
06/09/2015
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/10/2015.
House
05/28/2015
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
House
05/27/2015
Reported with amendments (8-0).
House
05/26/2015
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.