House | 06/15/2015 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
House | 06/10/2015 | Enrolled, signed by the Speaker of the House and taken by the Clerk of the House to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
House | 06/10/2015 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 86, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. | ||
House | 06/10/2015 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 06/10/2015 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 06/09/2015 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/10/2015. | ||
House | 06/03/2015 | Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading. |