House | 06/12/2015 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
House | 06/10/2015 | Enrolled, signed by the Speaker of the House and taken by the Clerk of the House to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
House | 06/10/2015 | Read by title, amended, roll called, yeas 95, nays 1. The resolution was adopted. | ||
House | 06/10/2015 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 06/10/2015 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 06/09/2015 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/10/2015. | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Reported with amendments (12-0). | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |