LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2015 Regular Session
House
Bills
HR79
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HR79
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2015 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HR79
Action History
House
06/10/2015
Read by title, withdrawn from the files of the House.
House
06/09/2015
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/10/2015.
House
05/27/2015
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
House
05/26/2015
Reported favorably (14-0).
House
05/12/2015
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
House
05/11/2015
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.