House | 06/04/2015 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
House | 06/02/2015 | Enrolled, signed by the Speaker of the House and taken by the Clerk of the House to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
House | 06/01/2015 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 67, nays 21. The resolution was adopted. | ||
House | 06/01/2015 | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Reported with amendments (7-0). | ||
House | 05/18/2015 | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |