House | 05/07/2015 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 20 yeas and 13 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Called from the Calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Retirement. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2015 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement. |