Senate
|
06/29/2015
|
Effective date 8/1/2015.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2015
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 259.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2015
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2015
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2015
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2015
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/2/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Reported with amendments (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 2 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|