House
|
06/08/2015
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 49, nays 50. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/08/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2015
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2015
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2015
|
Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2015
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2015
|
Reported favorably (11-6).
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Reported favorably (11-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 4 nays; ordered re- reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered reengrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2015
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|