Senate
|
07/01/2015
|
Effective date 7/1/2015.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2015
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 454.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2015
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 95, nays 1. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
Conference committee report received.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2015
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2015
|
House conferees appointed: Arnold, Simon, and Adams.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2015
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2015
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Heitmeier, Buffington, and Claitor.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2015
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2015
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2015
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2015
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2015
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/03/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Reported with amendments (14-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2015
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|