Senate | 04/29/2015 | The amended bill was read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2015 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |