Senate
|
06/23/2015
|
Effective date 6/23/2015.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2015
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 168.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2015
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2015
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2015
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/03/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Reported favorably (6-3). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 25 yeas and 12 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2015
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|