Senate
|
07/01/2015
|
Effective date: See Act.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2015
|
Becomes Act No. 473
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/15/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2015
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2015
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2015
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2015
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2015
|
Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/08/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2015
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Reported favorably (14-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2015
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|