Senate
|
06/19/2015
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2015
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/12/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2015
|
Notice of Senate adoption of original Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 3 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2015
|
Senate reconsidered the report of the Conference Committee and recommitted the bill to the Conference Commitee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
The Senate recommitted the report to the Conference Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Reconsidered.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2015
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 83, nays 14. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2015
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 31 yeas and 1 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/11/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
House conferees appointed: St. Germain, Tim Burns, and Arnold.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2015
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Johns, Morrish, and Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2015
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2015
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2015
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2015
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2015
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2015
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2015
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 83, nays 13. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2015
|
Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/08/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2015
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2015
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
Reported with amendments (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Read by title, amended, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Reported with amendments (12-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 3 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2015
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|