Senate
|
07/01/2015
|
Effective date 7/1/2015.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2015
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 468.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2015
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/12/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2015
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2015
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 91, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2015
|
Conference Committee report received.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2015
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2015
|
House conferees appointed: Robideaux, Thibaut, and Lambert.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2015
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2015
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Erdey, Donahue, and Adley.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2015
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2015
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2015
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2015
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/04/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Reported favorably (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|