House | 05/21/2015 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |