House | 06/01/2015 | Involuntarily deferred in committee. | ||
House | 05/27/2015 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 05/26/2015 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2015 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Finance. |