The original instrument and the following digest, which constitutes no part of the legislative instrument, were prepared by Jeanne C. Johnston. DIGEST SB 52 Original 2015 Regular Session Appel Proposed law re-creates the Dept. of Education for four more years. Changes termination date from July 1, 2017, to July 1, 2019. Present law (sunset law) provides that the Dept. of Education and all the statutory entities made a part of that department by law shall begin to terminate their operations on July 1, 2016, and that all legislative authority for such entities shall cease as of July 1, 2017, unless the legislature enacts a bill authorizing the re-creation of the department and its statutory entities prior thereto. Proposed law provides for the general re-creation of the Dept. of Education and its statutory entities, effective June 30, 2015, in accordance with the sunset law. Supersedes the provisions of the sunset law which set out the procedure for review and re-creation and which require a separate bill to re- create each statutory entity within the department along with additional provisions. July 1, 2019, is the new termination date, and termination would begin July 1, 2018, unless the department is again re-created. Effective June 30, 2015. (Adds R.S. 49:191(8)(m); repeals R.S. 49:191(6)(f))