Louisiana 2015 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SB52 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    RÉSUMÉ DIGEST
Act 153 (SB 52) 2015 Regular Session	Appel
Re-creates the Dept. of Education for four more years.  Changes termination date from July
1, 2017, to July 1, 2019.
Prior law (sunset law) provided that the Dept. of Education and all the statutory entities made
a part of that department by law shall begin to terminate their operations on July 1, 2016, and
that all legislative authority for such entities shall cease as of July 1, 2017, unless the
legislature enacts a bill authorizing the re-creation of the department and its statutory entities
prior thereto.
New law provides for the general re-creation of the Dept. of Education and its statutory
entities, effective June 30, 2015, in accordance with the sunset law.  Supersedes the
provisions of the sunset law which set out the procedure for review and re-creation and
which require a separate bill to re-create each statutory entity within the department along
with additional provisions.  July 1, 2019, is the new termination date, and termination would
begin July 1, 2018, unless the department is again re-created.
Effective June 30, 2015.
(Adds R.S. 49:191(8)(m); repeals R.S. 49:191(6)(f))