Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Effective date 8/1/2015.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/18/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Reported favorably (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Discharged from the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|