Senate
|
07/01/2015
|
Effective date 8/1/2015.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2015
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 449.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2015
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/12/2015.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2015
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 89, nays 6. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/11/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 26 yeas and 9 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2015
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2015
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2015
|
House conferees appointed: Barras, Tim Burns, and Montoucet.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2015
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Amedee, Perry, and Murray.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and failed to be concurred in by a vote of 19 yeas and 15 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 64, nays 26. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/2/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Reported with amendments (8-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 23 yeas and 13 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|