SLS 15RS-2242 ORIGINAL 2015 Regular Session SENATE CONCURRENT RESOL UTION NO. 107 BY SENATOR DORSEY-COLOMB CONDOLENCES. Expresses condolences upon the death of Lynne G. Piglia Marino. 1 A CONCURRENT RESOL UTION 2 To express the sincere condolences of the Legislature of Louisiana upon the death of Lynne 3 G. Piglia Marino. 4 WHEREAS, it is with deep regret and profound sorrow that the Legislature of 5 Louisiana has learned of the passing of Lynne G. Piglia Marino on May 18, 2015, at age 6 seventy-eight, after fighting an almost year-long battle with pancreatic cancer; and 7 WHEREAS, Lynne Gautreaux was born on May 23, 1936, grew up in New Orleans, 8 and graduated from Redemptorist High School, Loyola University, and St. Mary's 9 Dominican College; and 10 WHEREAS, she raised her four children, Edward, Ellen, Nancy, and Pam, as a single 11 mother for most of their lives while working two jobs and attending night school; and 12 WHEREAS, Lynne was an administrative assistant at Pelican Printing and the 13 Pontchartrain Hotel and an office manager for Pan American Life; she was past president 14 for both the New Orleans' Secretary's Association and the National Secretary's Association; 15 and she was the accountant for Ed White and Associates for over thirty-one years; and 16 WHEREAS, on July 12, 2002, she learned that her daughter, Pam Kinamore, had 17 disappeared from her Baton Rouge home with her body being found four days later under 18 Interstate 10 near Whiskey Bay, one of seven apparent female victims of a serial killer; and Page 1 of 3 SCR NO. 107 SLS 15RS-2242 ORIGINAL 1 WHEREAS, after the death of her daughter, she became a driving force behind the 2 investigation into the slayings; and 3 WHEREAS, Lynne organized rallies on the Louisiana State Capitol steps and 4 galvanized family members of past victims who, until then, had no advocate and no voice; 5 upon uncovering a lack of funds appropriated for DNA testing in Louisiana, she successfully 6 campaigned to secure additional funding; she traveled across the country to do interviews 7 on national television programs and gave interviews to newspapers and magazines, was an 8 invited speaker at the FBI Headquarters in Quantico, Virginia, and became the spokesperson 9 for Victims and Citizens against Crime; and 10 WHEREAS, through such efforts and in recognition of and in support for the families 11 and friends of the seven victims, the Legislature of Louisiana adopted resolutions that 12 recognized April 9, 2003, as a Day of Prayer in Louisiana for the victims of the South 13 Louisiana serial killer and for the victims' families, recognized Tuesday, June 17, 2003, as 14 a Day of Prayer and Comfort paralleling a proclamation issued by Governor M. J. "Mike" 15 Foster, and in 2004, recognized the month of April every year as "Crime Victims Awareness 16 and Memorial Month" in order to promote public awareness of and educate the public on the 17 need to prevent violent crimes against women; and 18 WHEREAS, in recognition of such advocacy, she was named to and served on the 19 Interagency Council on the Prevention of Sex Offenses; and 20 WHEREAS, Lynne Marino was extraordinary, fearless, tenacious, resilient, 21 straight-forward, and always at the top of her game and made a positive difference in the 22 lives of families of the victims of the serial killer to whom she was a leader and a warrior 23 seeking justice; and 24 WHEREAS, in a rare event, she was permitted to speak to the Louisiana Senate from 25 the chair of the President while the Senate was in session; and 26 WHEREAS, following Hurricane Katrina, she relocated to Gonzales and lived in The 27 Greens where she was involved in the Civic Association and served on various committees; 28 and 29 WHEREAS, Lynne loved working in her garden, traveling around the world, and was 30 an avid collector of fine antiques and true friends; and Page 2 of 3 SCR NO. 107 SLS 15RS-2242 ORIGINAL 1 WHEREAS, she was preceded in death by her daughter, Pam Piglia Kinamore, and 2 her parents, Irma and Noah Gautreaux; and 3 WHEREAS, Lynne G. Piglia Marino is survived by her sister, Carol Gautreaux 4 LeBlance (Jesse); her three children: Edward Piglia Jr. (Kathleen), Nancy Piglia Thomas 5 (Gerard) and Ellen Piglia White (Ed); twelve grandchildren: Justin, Joshua, James and Jesse 6 Thomas, Jessica Piglia, Jacob Kinamore, Natalie and Rebecca White, Dana Diaz and 7 Rechelle Diaz Brooks, Kerri W. Booker and Brent White; and five great-grandchildren; and 8 WHEREAS, her surviving family members and many friends, particularly the 9 families of victims of the serial killer, will forever remember her by the following: 10 May the life I lived speak for me, 11 May the service I gave speak for me, 12 May the work I've done speak for me. 13 THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Legislature of Louisiana does hereby 14 commemorate the life of Lynne G. Piglia Marino, does hereby recognize and record for 15 posterity her significant contributions, and does hereby express the deep regret upon the loss 16 of this extraordinary individual. 17 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a copy of this Resolution be transmitted to each 18 of Lynne G. Piglia Marino's children, Edward Piglia, Ellen White, and Nancy Thomas. The original instrument and the following digest, which constitutes no part of the legislative instrument, were prepared by Jerry J. Guillot. DIGEST SCR 107 Original 2015 Regular Session Dorsey-Colomb Expresses condolences upon the death of Lynne G. Piglia Marino. Page 3 of 3