2015 Regular Session ENROLLED SENATE CONCURRENT RESOL UTION NO. 107 BY SENATOR DORSEY-COLOMB A CONCURRENT RESOL UTION To express the sincere condolences of the Legislature of Louisiana upon the death of Lynne G. Piglia Marino. WHEREAS, it is with deep regret and profound sorrow that the Legislature of Louisiana has learned of the passing of Lynne G. Piglia Marino on May 18, 2015, at age seventy-eight, after fighting an almost year-long battle with pancreatic cancer; and WHEREAS, Lynne Gautreaux was born on May 23, 1936, grew up in New Orleans, and graduated from Redemptorist High School, Loyola University, and St. Mary's Dominican College; and WHEREAS, she raised her four children, Edward, Ellen, Nancy, and Pam, as a single mother for most of their lives while working two jobs and attending night school; and WHEREAS, Lynne was an administrative assistant at Pelican Printing and the Pontchartrain Hotel and an office manager for Pan American Life; she was past president for both the New Orleans' Secretary's Association and the National Secretary's Association; and she was the accountant for Ed White and Associates for over thirty-one years; and WHEREAS, on July 12, 2002, she learned that her daughter, Pam Kinamore, had disappeared from her Baton Rouge home with her body being found four days later under Interstate 10 near Whiskey Bay, one of seven apparent female victims of a serial killer; and WHEREAS, after the death of her daughter, she became a driving force behind the investigation into the slayings; and WHEREAS, Lynne organized rallies on the Louisiana State Capitol steps and galvanized family members of past victims who, until then, had no advocate and no voice; upon uncovering a lack of funds appropriated for DNA testing in Louisiana, she successfully campaigned to secure additional funding; she traveled across the country to do interviews on national television programs and gave interviews to newspapers and magazines, was an invited speaker at the FBI Headquarters in Quantico, Virginia, and became the spokesperson for Victims and Citizens against Crime; and Page 1 of 3 SCR NO. 107 ENROLLED WHEREAS, through such efforts and in recognition of and in support for the families and friends of the seven victims, the Legislature of Louisiana adopted resolutions that recognized April 9, 2003, as a Day of Prayer in Louisiana for the victims of the South Louisiana serial killer and for the victims' families, recognized Tuesday, June 17, 2003, as a Day of Prayer and Comfort paralleling a proclamation issued by Governor M. J. "Mike" Foster, and in 2004, recognized the month of April every year as "Crime Victims Awareness and Memorial Month" in order to promote public awareness of and educate the public on the need to prevent violent crimes against women; and WHEREAS, in recognition of such advocacy, she was named to and served on the Interagency Council on the Prevention of Sex Offenses; and WHEREAS, Lynne Marino was extraordinary, fearless, tenacious, resilient, straight-forward, and always at the top of her game and made a positive difference in the lives of families of the victims of the serial killer to whom she was a leader and a warrior seeking justice; and WHEREAS, in a rare event, she was permitted to speak to the Louisiana Senate from the chair of the President while the Senate was in session; and WHEREAS, following Hurricane Katrina, she relocated to Gonzales and lived in The Greens where she was involved in the Civic Association and served on various committees; and WHEREAS, Lynne loved working in her garden, traveling around the world, and was an avid collector of fine antiques and true friends; and WHEREAS, she was preceded in death by her daughter, Pam Piglia Kinamore, and her parents, Irma and Noah Gautreaux; and WHEREAS, Lynne G. Piglia Marino is survived by her sister, Carol Gautreaux LeBlance (Jesse); her three children: Edward Piglia Jr. (Kathleen), Nancy Piglia Thomas (Gerard) and Ellen Piglia White (Ed); twelve grandchildren: Justin, Joshua, James and Jesse Thomas, Jessica Piglia, Jacob Kinamore, Natalie and Rebecca White, Dana Diaz and Rechelle Diaz Brooks, Kerri W. Booker and Brent White; and five great-grandchildren; and WHEREAS, her surviving family members and many friends, particularly the families of victims of the serial killer, will forever remember her by the following: Page 2 of 3 SCR NO. 107 ENROLLED May the life I lived speak for me, May the service I gave speak for me, May the work I've done speak for me. THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Legislature of Louisiana does hereby commemorate the life of Lynne G. Piglia Marino, does hereby recognize and record for posterity her significant contributions, and does hereby express the deep regret upon the loss of this extraordinary individual. BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a copy of this Resolution be transmitted to each of Lynne G. Piglia Marino's children, Edward Piglia, Ellen White, and Nancy Thomas. PRESIDENT OF THE SENATE SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES Page 3 of 3