Louisiana 2015 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SCR107 Enrolled / Bill

                    2015 Regular Session	ENROLLED
SENATE CONCURRENT RESOL UTION NO. 107
BY SENATOR DORSEY-COLOMB 
A CONCURRENT RESOL UTION
To express the sincere condolences of the Legislature of Louisiana upon the death of Lynne
G. Piglia Marino.
WHEREAS, it is with deep regret and profound sorrow that the Legislature of
Louisiana has learned of the passing of Lynne G. Piglia Marino on May 18, 2015, at age
seventy-eight, after fighting an almost year-long battle with pancreatic cancer; and 
WHEREAS, Lynne Gautreaux was born on May 23, 1936, grew up in New Orleans,
and graduated from Redemptorist High School, Loyola University, and St. Mary's
Dominican College; and
WHEREAS, she raised her four children, Edward, Ellen, Nancy, and Pam, as a single
mother for most of their lives while working two jobs and attending night school; and
WHEREAS, Lynne was an administrative assistant at Pelican Printing and the
Pontchartrain Hotel and an office manager for Pan American Life; she was past president
for both the New Orleans' Secretary's Association and the National Secretary's Association;
and she was the accountant for Ed White and Associates for over thirty-one years; and 
WHEREAS, on July 12, 2002, she learned that her daughter, Pam Kinamore, had
disappeared from her Baton Rouge home with her body being found four days later under
Interstate 10 near Whiskey Bay, one of seven apparent female victims of a serial killer; and
WHEREAS, after the death of her daughter, she became a driving force behind the
investigation into the slayings; and 
WHEREAS, Lynne organized rallies on the Louisiana State Capitol steps and
galvanized family members of past victims who, until then, had no advocate and no voice;
upon uncovering a lack of funds appropriated for DNA testing in Louisiana, she successfully
campaigned to secure additional funding; she traveled across the country to do interviews
on national television programs and gave interviews to newspapers and magazines, was an
invited speaker at the FBI Headquarters in Quantico, Virginia, and became the spokesperson
for Victims and Citizens against Crime; and 
Page 1 of 3 SCR NO. 107	ENROLLED
WHEREAS, through such efforts and in recognition of and in support for the families
and friends of the seven victims, the Legislature of Louisiana adopted resolutions that
recognized April 9, 2003, as a Day of Prayer in Louisiana for the victims of the South
Louisiana serial killer and for the victims' families, recognized Tuesday, June 17, 2003, as
a Day of Prayer and Comfort paralleling a proclamation issued by Governor M. J. "Mike"
Foster, and in 2004, recognized the month of April every year as "Crime Victims Awareness
and Memorial Month" in order to promote public awareness of and educate the public on the
need to prevent violent crimes against women; and 
WHEREAS, in recognition of such advocacy, she was named to and served on the
Interagency Council on the Prevention of Sex Offenses; and 
WHEREAS, Lynne Marino was extraordinary, fearless, tenacious, resilient,
straight-forward, and always at the top of her game and made a positive difference in the
lives of families of the victims of the serial killer to whom she was a leader and a warrior
seeking justice; and 
WHEREAS, in a rare event, she was permitted to speak to the Louisiana Senate from
the chair of the President while the Senate was in session; and 
WHEREAS, following Hurricane Katrina, she relocated to Gonzales and lived in The
Greens where she was involved in the Civic Association and served on various committees;
and 
WHEREAS, Lynne loved working in her garden, traveling around the world, and was
an avid collector of fine antiques and true friends; and
WHEREAS, she was preceded in death by her daughter, Pam Piglia Kinamore, and
her parents, Irma and Noah Gautreaux; and
WHEREAS, Lynne G. Piglia Marino is survived by her sister, Carol Gautreaux
LeBlance (Jesse); her three children: Edward Piglia Jr. (Kathleen), Nancy Piglia Thomas
(Gerard) and Ellen Piglia White (Ed); twelve grandchildren: Justin, Joshua, James and Jesse
Thomas, Jessica Piglia, Jacob Kinamore, Natalie and Rebecca White, Dana Diaz and
Rechelle Diaz Brooks, Kerri W. Booker and Brent White; and five great-grandchildren; and
WHEREAS, her surviving family members and many friends, particularly the
families of victims of the serial killer, will forever remember her by the following:
Page 2 of 3 SCR NO. 107	ENROLLED
May the life I lived speak for me,
May the service I gave speak for me,
May the work I've done speak for me. 
THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Legislature of Louisiana does hereby
commemorate the life of Lynne G. Piglia Marino, does hereby recognize and record for
posterity her significant contributions, and does hereby express the deep regret upon the loss
of this extraordinary individual.
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a copy of this Resolution be transmitted to each
of Lynne G. Piglia Marino's children, Edward Piglia, Ellen White, and Nancy Thomas.
PRESIDENT OF THE SENATE
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
Page 3 of 3