Senate | 06/11/2015 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/15/2015. | ||
House | 06/07/2015 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 06/05/2015 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 06/04/2015 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 06/04/2015 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | ||
House | 06/03/2015 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. | ||
House | 06/03/2015 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 06/03/2015 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 06/02/2015 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |