Senate | 06/11/2015 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/15/2015. | ||
House | 06/10/2015 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 06/10/2015 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 06/10/2015 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 06/10/2015 | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 94 yeas, 0 nays. | ||
House | 06/09/2015 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/10/2015. | ||
House | 06/09/2015 | Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 06/08/2015 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. | ||
House | 06/08/2015 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 06/08/2015 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |