Senate | 05/04/2015 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |