Senate | 05/26/2015 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | ||
House | 05/19/2015 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 05/18/2015 | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 87 yeas, 0 nays. | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/18/2015. | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/13/2015 | Reported favorably (11-0). | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |