LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2015 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR45
Action History
LA
Louisiana Senate Bill SCR45
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2015 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SCR45
Action History
House
05/28/2015
Read by title, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
House
05/27/2015
Received in the House from the Senate.
Senate
05/27/2015
Read by title and adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 1 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
Senate
05/26/2015
Reported favorably.
Senate
04/21/2015
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
Senate
04/20/2015
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.