Senate | 05/26/2015 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | ||
House | 05/19/2015 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 05/18/2015 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 1 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |