Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/15/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2015
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2015
|
Read by title, concurred in by vote of 97 yeas, 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/03/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Reported favorably (8-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|