Senate | 06/08/2015 | Returned to the Senate and approved. | ||
House | 06/08/2015 | Approved on 6/8/2015. | ||
House | 06/04/2015 | Study request list distributed to members on 6/4/2015. | ||
House | 06/03/2015 | Received on 6/3/2015. | ||
Senate | 06/03/2015 | Sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2015 | Study request list distributed to the members on 5/28/2015. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Request study by the committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Received by the Senate Office on 5/27/2015. |