Senate | 06/11/2015 | Returned to the Senate and approved. | ||
House | 06/11/2015 | Approved on 6/11/2015. | ||
House | 06/09/2015 | Study request list distributed to members on 6/9/2015. | ||
House | 06/05/2015 | Received on 6/5/2015. | ||
Senate | 06/05/2015 | Sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 06/03/2015 | Study request list distributed to the members on 6/3/2015. | ||
Senate | 06/02/2015 | Request study by the committee on Judiciary C. | ||
Senate | 06/02/2015 | Received by the Senate Office on 6/2/2015. |