Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR57

Introduced
4/27/15  
Introduced
4/27/15  

Caption

Commends the Louisiana Physical Therapy Association for its outstanding achievements and designates April 27 through May 1, 2015, as Louisiana Physical Therapy Association Week.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Previously Filed As

LA SR115

Commends the Louisiana Physical Therapy Association for its outstanding achievements and designates the week of May 13, 2013, as "Louisiana Physical Therapy Association Week".

LA SR40

Commends the Louisiana Physical Therapy Association for its outstanding achievements and designates the week of March 31, 2014, as Louisiana Physical Therapy Association Week.

LA HR114

Commends the Louisiana Physical Therapy Association for its outstanding achievements and designates May 9, 2019, as Louisiana Physical Therapy Association Day at the state capitol

LA SR24

Commends the Louisiana Physical Therapy Association for its outstanding achievements and designates the week of March 26, 2012, as "Louisiana Physical Therapy Association Week".

LA SR18

Commends the Louisiana Physical Therapy Association for its outstanding achievements and designates Tuesday, April 13, 2010, as "Louisiana Physical Therapy Association Day."

LA HR10

Commends the La. Physical Therapy Association and designates March 14 through March 18, 2016, as Louisiana Physical Therapy Association Week

LA HR36

Commends the Louisiana Physical Therapy Association and designates Tuesday, April 18, 2017, as Louisiana Physical Therapy Association Day at the state capitol

LA HR65

Commends the Louisiana Physical Therapy Association and designates April 10, 2018, as Louisiana Physical Therapy Association Day at the state capitol

Similar Bills

LA HCR84

Directs the La. State Law Institute to reorganize and recodify the Miscellaneous Health Provisions chapter of Title 40 of the La. Revised Statutes

LA HCR196

Urges and requests a study of the means by which the La. State Board of Nursing may obtain access to investigative records

LA HCR173

Requests that the Bd. of Regents and the State Bd. of Elementary and Secondary Education, with the Taylor Foundation, La. Office of Student Financial Assistance, public postsecondary education management boards, and certain others, study certain issues relative to TOPS

LA HCR104

Requests the Louisiana Workforce Commission and the Louisiana Department of Veterans Affairs to study employment practices and professional licensing requirements to benefit veterans in the workforce

LA HB874

Makes supplemental appropriations for Fiscal Year 2017-2018

LA SB31

Provides for the repeal of certain inactive or obsolete healthcare laws. (8/1/22)

LA SB212

Provides for the membership of the Prescription Monitoring Program Advisory Council. (8/15/10)

LA SCR65

Creates a task force to study meaningful oversight of the professional healthcare licensing boards statutorily created within the Department of Health and Hospitals.