Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR95 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version

                            2015 Regular Session	ENROLLED
SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 95
BY SENATORS DORSEY-COLOMB, BROOME AND PETERSON 
A RESOLUTION
To commend and congratulate Loretta Lynch on being the first African-American woman
to be sworn in as Attorney General of the United States.
WHEREAS, it is with great pleasure that the members of the Senate of the
Legislature of Louisiana have learned that Loretta Lynch has been confirmed by the United
States Senate, making her the first African-American woman and the second woman to be
confirmed for the position; and
WHEREAS, Loretta Elizabeth Lynch was born on May 21, 1959, to Lorenzo and
Lorine Lynch in Greensboro, North Carolina, and in 2007, married Stephen Hargrove; and 
WHEREAS, Lynch attended Harvard College where she was a chartering member
of the Xi Tau chapter of Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc. and earned a Bachelor of Arts in
English and American Literature in 1981, and a Juris Doctor from Harvard Law School in
1984; and
WHEREAS, in 1990, Lynch first joined the U.S. Attorney General's office for the
Eastern District of New York as an assistant U.S. Attorney prosecuting drug and violent
crimes; and
WHEREAS, from 1994 to 1998, she served as the chief of the Long Island office and
from 1998 to 1999, she was named chief assistant U.S. Attorney in the Eastern District of
New York and headed the Brooklyn office; and
WHEREAS, Attorney Lynch was nominated by President Bill Clinton and confirmed
by the United States Senate to serve as the U.S. Attorney for the Eastern District of New
York from June 2, 1999, to May 2, 2001; and
WHEREAS, Attorney Lynch was nominated by President Barack Obama and
confirmed by the United States Senate to serve as the U.S. Attorney for the Eastern District
of New York for a second term from May 8, 2010, to April 27, 2015; and 
Page 1 of 2 SR NO. 95	ENROLLED
WHEREAS, as U.S. Attorney, Lynch earned a reputation as a highly qualified, but
low profile prosecutor who has a good relationship with law enforcement and a history of
handling tough cases well; and 
WHEREAS, on November 8, 2014, President Barack Obama nominated Lynch for
the position of U.S. Attorney General to succeed Eric Holder, and she was confirmed by the
United States Senate Judiciary Committee of February 26, 2015, and approved by the United
States Senate on April 23, 2015; and 
WHEREAS, Attorney Lynch serves as an example to all that hard work and
persistence do indeed pay off; and 
WHEREAS, the success of equal justice for all, the strength of our communities, and
the overall vitality of American society depend, in great measure, upon people like United
States Attorney General Loretta Lynch; and
WHEREAS, her extraordinary accomplishments and contributions to the nation are
exemplary and commendable, and her work will continue to be recognized and appreciated
for generations to come.
THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Senate of the Legislature of Louisiana
does hereby commend and congratulate United States Attorney General Loretta Lynch on
being the first African-American woman to serve as United States Attorney General.
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a copy of this Resolution be transmitted to
United States Attorney General Loretta Lynch.
PRESIDENT OF THE SENATE
Page 2 of 2