House | 03/02/2016 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 31, nays 65. Failed to pass. | ||
House | 03/02/2016 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 03/01/2016 | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/02/2016. | ||
House | 03/01/2016 | Notice removed | ||
House | 03/01/2016 | Notice given. | ||
House | 03/01/2016 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 02/29/2016 | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/01/2016. | ||
House | 02/26/2016 | Scheduled for floor debate on 02/29/2016. | ||
House | 02/25/2016 | Scheduled for floor debate on 02/26/2016. | ||
House | 02/25/2016 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 02/25/2016 | Rules suspended. | ||
House | 02/25/2016 | Reported favorably (21-0). | ||
House | 02/23/2016 | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |