House
|
03/14/2016
|
Effective date: 03/14/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2016
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 22.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2016
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2016
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2016
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 3, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 03/04/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2016
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2016
|
The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2016
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2016
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2016
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2016
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 5. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 02/25/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2016
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2016
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2016
|
Reported favorably (19-0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2016
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|