House
|
03/17/2016
|
Effective date: See Act.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2016
|
Becomes Act No. 31.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2016
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2016
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2016
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2016
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2016
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 8 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2016
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2016
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2016
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2016
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2016
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2016
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 82, nays 14. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 02/26/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2016
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2016
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 02/25/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2016
|
Passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2016
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2016
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2016
|
Reported without action, (18-0) with recommendation to recommit to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2016
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|