House
|
03/07/2016
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 03/07/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2016
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2016
|
Notice removed
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2016
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 03/06/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 03/04/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 03/03/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 03/02/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 03/01/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 02/29/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 02/26/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 02/25/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2016
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2016
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2016
|
Reported without action, (19-0) with recommendation to recommit to the Committee of the Whole.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2016
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2016
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2016
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|