Senate
|
03/09/2016
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2016
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2016
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2016
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2016
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2016
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2016
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 80, nays 18. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2016
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 02/25/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2016
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2016
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2016
|
Reported with amendments (18-0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2016
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|