Senate
|
03/09/2016
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2016
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 75, nays 22. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2016
|
Conference Committee report received.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2016
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Morrell, Peacock, and Peterson.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2016
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2016
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2016
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2016
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2016
|
House conferees appointed: Stokes, Abramson, and Jim Morris.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2016
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2016
|
Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 03/07/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2016
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 8 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2016
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2016
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2016
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2016
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 67, nays 32. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 02/25/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2016
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2016
|
Reported favorably (19-0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2016
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|