House
|
03/14/2016
|
Effective date: 04/01/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2016
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 25.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2016
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2016
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 3/14/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2016
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2016
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2016
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2016
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 75, nays 27. Having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2016
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 27 yeas and 11 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2016
|
Conference Committee report received.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2016
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2016
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Morrell, LaFleur, and Alario.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2016
|
Notice the House rejected the Senate amendments; House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2016
|
House conferees appointed: Jay Morris, Abramson, and Jim Morris.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2016
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 5. The Senate amendments were rejected. Conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2016
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2016
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 2 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2016
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2016
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2016
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2016
|
Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2016
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2016
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 87, nays 15. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2016
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2016
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2016
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 66, nays 32. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 03/06/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
Notice removed
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 03/04/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 03/03/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 03/02/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 03/01/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 02/29/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2016
|
Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 02/26/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 02/25/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2016
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2016
|
Reported without action, (18-0) with recommendation to recommit to the Committee of the Whole.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2016
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|