House
|
03/14/2016
|
Effective date: 04/01/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2016
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 26.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2016
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2016
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 3/14/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2016
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2016
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2016
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2016
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 86, nays 17. Having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2016
|
Conference Committee report received.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2016
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 5 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2016
|
Reconsidered.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2016
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 3 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2016
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2016
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Morrell, Alario, and LaFleur.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2016
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2016
|
House conferees appointed: Jackson, Abramson, and Jim Morris.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2016
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 102, nays 0, The Senate amendments. having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were rejected. Conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 03/04/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 03/03/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2016
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2016
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 10 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2016
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2016
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2016
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2016
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 76, nays 28. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2016
|
Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 02/25/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2016
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2016
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2016
|
Reported without action, (17-0) with recommendation to recommit to the Committee of the Whole.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2016
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|