House
|
03/09/2016
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2016
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 20 yeas and 16 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2016
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2016
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2016
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2016
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 11. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2016
|
Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2016
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 03/07/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2016
|
Notice removed
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2016
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2016
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 03/06/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 03/04/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 03/03/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 03/02/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 03/01/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 02/29/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 02/26/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 02/25/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2016
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2016
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2016
|
Reported without action, (18-0) with recommendation to recommit to the Committee of the Whole.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2016
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|