Senate
|
03/04/2016
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2016
|
Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2016
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2016
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2016
|
Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2016
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 02/26/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2016
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2016
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 02/25/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2016
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2016
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2016
|
Reported with amendments (17-0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2016
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|