House | 03/01/2016 | Notice removed | ||
House | 02/25/2016 | Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules. | ||
House | 02/24/2016 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 49, nays 46. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider pending. | ||
House | 02/23/2016 | Scheduled for floor debate on 02/24/2016. | ||
House | 02/23/2016 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 02/22/2016 | Reported favorably (18-0). | ||
House | 02/19/2016 | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |