House | 03/14/2016 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
Senate | 03/09/2016 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
House | 03/08/2016 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 03/08/2016 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. | ||
House | 03/07/2016 | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/08/2016. | ||
House | 03/07/2016 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | ||
Senate | 03/07/2016 | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2016 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 03/06/2016 | Read by title, rules suspended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 101, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |