Senate
|
03/03/2016
|
Effective date 3/3/2016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2016
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2016
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 2/26/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2016
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2016
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2016
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2016
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 02/24/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2016
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2016
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2016
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2016
|
Reported favorably (20-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2016
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2016
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2016
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2016
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2016
|
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|