Senate
|
03/09/2016
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2016
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 86, nays 13. Having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2016
|
Conference Committee report received.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2016
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2016
|
House conferees appointed: Moreno, Abramson, and Jim Morris.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2016
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2016
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2016
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Morrell, Martiny, and Carter.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2016
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2016
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2016
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2016
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 8. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2016
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2016
|
Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 03/08/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 03/07/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
Reported with amendments (16-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2016
|
Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2016
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 2 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2016
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title; ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2016
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|